Global Patent Index - EP 1145167 A3

EP 1145167 A3 2001-12-19 - PROCESS MANAGEMENT GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE, SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (en)

PROCESS MANAGEMENT GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE, SYSTEM AND METHOD

Title (de)

GRAPHISCHE BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PROZESSVERWALTUNG

Title (fr)

INTERFACE GRAPHIQUE, SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE PROCESSUS

Publication

EP 1145167 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00938395 A

Priority

  • CA 0000689 W
  • US 34339199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0103023A2] A method, GUI and system for managing a process defined by a plurality of tasks capable of being completed by different users and intended to be executed in a particular order. The method includes displaying task elements corresponding to the tasks in the process, graphically identifying the task elements corresponding to tasks which have been completed and, if the user of the method is capable of completing the next uncompleted task, specially identifying the corresponding task element. These steps are repeated upon completion of the next uncompleted task. In this way, the progress of a process is tracked and the telco employee responsible for completing the next task in the process is alerted when the current task is completed, which achieves greater process efficiency, more reliable task execution and superior cost effectiveness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0103023 A2 20010111; WO 0103023 A3 20010802; AU 5380800 A 20010122; CA 2337933 A1 20010111; EP 1145167 A2 20011017; EP 1145167 A3 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020204

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.