Global Patent Index - EP 1145263 B1

EP 1145263 B1 2002-11-27 - LOW-VOLTAGE CIRCUIT-BREAKER WITH A RETROFITTED POWER-DRIVEN LIFT

Title (en)

LOW-VOLTAGE CIRCUIT-BREAKER WITH A RETROFITTED POWER-DRIVEN LIFT

Title (de)

NIEDERSPANNUNGS-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT EINEM NACHRÜSTBAREN MOTORAUFZUG

Title (fr)

DISJONCTEUR BASSE TENSION COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF ELEVATEUR A MOTEUR POUVANT ETRE MONTE APRES COUP

Publication

EP 1145263 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99944263 A

Priority

  • DE 9902030 W
  • DE 19832592 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19832592A1] The invention relates to a low-voltage circuit breaker with a retrofitted power-driven lift, whereby the output shaft thereof can be coupled to the charging shaft of the spring energy store of the low-voltage circuit breaker and said charging shaft is mounted in a bearing block. Centering elements (9) are provided on one flange of the bearing block (11) of the charging shaft (12) of the spring energy store and engage with counter elements (10) on the output side of the gear of the power-driven elevator (5) in such a way that the lift can extend axially with only a limited amount of travel in the direction of the charging shaft (12). In order to arrest the power-driven lift (5) in a pivoting direction, a fixing element is provided at a point located at a certain distance from the centre, in addition to means enabling the power-driven lift (5) to be fixed in an axial position in the centering elements (9) of the flange of the bearing block (11) of the charging shaft (12) of the lift of the spring and in the coupling (8) of the charging shaft (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/26 (2006.01); H01H 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/26 (2013.01); H01H 3/3005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19832592 A1 20000113; EP 1145263 A2 20011017; EP 1145263 B1 20021127; US 6380830 B1 20020430; WO 0003405 A2 20000120; WO 0003405 A3 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090630

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903604 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.