Global Patent Index - EP 1145272 A3

EP 1145272 A3 2002-11-27 - IMPROVED ALIGNMENT OF A THERMAL FIELD EMISSION ELECTRON SOURCE AND APPLICATION IN A MICROCOLUMN

Title (en)

IMPROVED ALIGNMENT OF A THERMAL FIELD EMISSION ELECTRON SOURCE AND APPLICATION IN A MICROCOLUMN

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE JUSTIERUNG EINER THERMISCHEN FELDEMISSIONS-ELEKTRONENQUELLE UND ANWENDUNG IN EINEM MIKRO- ELEKTRONENSTRAHLAPPARAT

Title (fr)

REGLAGE AMELIORE DE L'EMISSION D'UN CHAMP THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 1145272 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99954854 A

Priority

  • US 9923704 W
  • US 17661398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0024030A2] An electron-beam microcolumn alignment method and system in situ includes a split suppressor cap (124) for a miniature Schottky electron (16) or other field emission source. The split suppressor cap is segmented into four or more electrically separate electrode elements (124...130) which are independently driven and controlled by separate deflection voltages (Vs+/-Vx, Vs+/-Vy) to scan the electron beam without requiring mechanical movement.

[origin: WO0024030A2] An electron-beam microcolumn alignment method and system in situ includes a split suppressor cap for a miniature Schottky electron or other field emission source. The split suppressor cap is segmented into four or more electrically separate electrode elements, which are independently driven and controlled by separate deflection voltages to scan the electron beam without requiring mechanical movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/04 (2006.01); H01J 37/073 (2006.01); H01J 37/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/28 (2013.01); H01J 37/073 (2013.01); H01J 2237/06316 (2013.01); H01J 2237/1501 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0024030 A2 20000427; WO 0024030 A3 20021010; EP 1145272 A2 20011017; EP 1145272 A3 20021127; JP 2003513407 A 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: APPLIED MATERIALS, INC.

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01J 3/02 A

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.