Global Patent Index - EP 1145443 A3

EP 1145443 A3 2002-09-11 - 1BIT DIGITAL-ANALOG CONVERTER CIRCUIT

Title (en)

1BIT DIGITAL-ANALOG CONVERTER CIRCUIT

Title (de)

1BIT-DIGITAL-ANALOG-WANDLER-SCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT CONVERTISSEUR NUMERIQUE-ANALOGIQUE 1 BIT

Publication

EP 1145443 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00920408 A

Priority

  • DE 0000886 W
  • DE 19912827 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057558A2] The invention relates to a 1-bit digital-analogue converter circuit comprising outputs, switching units and pulse shaping units. Said outputs, switching units and pulse shaping units are decoupled from one another by decoupling units. The invention also relates to a 1-bit digital-analogue converter which has one or two outputs, two inputs, a switching unit and pulse shaping units. Each input is configured in a pair and each switching unit has a second switching unit allocated thereto, in such a way that each bit variation of the input bit forces a switching process to occur. In the case of a current switching i, the current i is adjusted to almost or exactly zero, whilst in the case of a switching to an electric potential, the corresponding potential difference is adjusted to almost or exactly zero.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03M 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03M 1/82 (2006.01); H03M 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03M 3/376 (2013.01); H03M 3/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5610606 A 19970311 - FUKUNAGA TOSHITAKA [JP], et al
  • [X] LERCH R G ET AL: "A MONOLITHIC SIGMA DELTA A/D AND D/A CONVERTER WITH FILTER FOR BROAD-BAND SPEECH CODING", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, vol. 26, no. 12, 1 December 1991 (1991-12-01), pages 1920 - 1926, XP000272852, ISSN: 0018-9200

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057558 A2 20000928; WO 0057558 A3 20010823; CN 1344437 A 20020410; EP 1145443 A2 20011017; EP 1145443 A3 20020911; JP 2002540670 A 20021126; US 6549152 B1 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03M 3/02 A

2004-03-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03K 17/16 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020221

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.