Global Patent Index - EP 1145547 A3

EP 1145547 A3 2002-09-18 - DEVICE FOR CREATING AN IMAGE FOR A FRONT VIEW BY MEANS OF AN INCIDENT PROJECTION

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CREATING AN IMAGE FOR A FRONT VIEW BY MEANS OF AN INCIDENT PROJECTION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES SZENENBILDES EINER FRONTSICHT DURCH EINE AUFLICHTPROJEKTION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CREATION D'UN DECOR D'UNE VUE FRONTALE AU MOYEN D'UNE PROJECTION FRONTALE DIRECTE

Publication

EP 1145547 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00971408 A

Priority

  • DE 19952896 A
  • EP 0010807 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0133841A2] The invention relates to a device for creating an image (1) for a front view by means of an incident projection, in particular for image display in a training station, in a simulator, or in an adventure world, by means of a projector (2, 3). Said device is characterised, whereby one or several projectors (2, 3) project the image of a normal view, onto a projection plane (6) within a projection dome, by means of a refracted, brightness- and/or colour-modulated light beam emanating from a point of origin, in the form of individual lines and images. Said projectors (2, 3) are arranged in a position, such that the point of origin of the projection beams lies in front of the front plane of a participating person (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/74; G09B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03B 21/10 (2006.01); G09B 9/05 (2006.01); G09B 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09B 9/32 (2013.01); G09B 9/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0133841 A2 20010510; WO 0133841 A3 20011213; CA 2355323 A1 20010510; CN 1336073 A 20020213; DE 19952896 C1 20010726; DE 19952896 C5 20050512; EP 1145547 A2 20011017; EP 1145547 A3 20020918; IL 144088 D0 20020523; JP 2003513322 A 20030408; KR 20010101368 A 20011114

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [R18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20040120

2004-04-07 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2004-03-10 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JENOPTIK LDT GMBH

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-17 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.