Global Patent Index - EP 1145664 A3

EP 1145664 A3 2003-06-04 - Adjustable ferrule paint brush and methods of manufacture

Title (en)

Adjustable ferrule paint brush and methods of manufacture

Title (de)

Pinsel mit einstellbarer Bürstenendhülse und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Pinceau avec embout réglable et procédés de fabrication

Publication

EP 1145664 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01710021 A

Priority

US 19651300 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1153555A2] A method for forming a plurality of distinct paint applicators having a common exterior head configuration and distinct paint applying medium configurations includes forming a plurality of handles and forming a plurality of paint carrying units. Each handle formed includes a head having an exterior configuration and an interior having a mouth and head thickness between the exterior configuration and the mouth. Each paint carrying unit includes at least one paint applying medium coupled to a mounting portion that is disposed within an interior of one of the plurality of handles. The mounting portion has a mounting portion exterior configuration and a mounting portion thickness between the mounting portion exterior configuration and the paint applying medium. To form the plurality of distinct paint applicators, the configuration of the paint applying medium is varied while at least one of the head thickness and the mounting portion thickness is also varied. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/08 (2006.01); A46B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/08 (2013.01); A46B 3/12 (2013.01); A46B 2200/202 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1153555 A2 20011114; EP 1153555 A3 20031112; CA 2343657 A1 20011011; CA 2343846 A1 20011011; EP 1145664 A2 20011017; EP 1145664 A3 20030604; US 2002004963 A1 20020117

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031101

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI