Global Patent Index - EP 1145698 A3

EP 1145698 A3 2003-06-04 - Stair climbing device

Title (en)

Stair climbing device

Title (de)

Treppensteigvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour monter des escaliers

Publication

EP 1145698 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01103425 A

Priority

DE 10018578 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10018578C1] The stair climbing device (1) has an attached grip unit allowing operation of the stair climbing device by the wheelchair user, a control device for controlling the functions of the stair climbing device and a sensor device, which provides a signal when possible tipping of the stair climbing device is indicated, for operation of an acoustic warning device, e.g. a spoken warning, via the control device. An extendible support device (40) can be operated by the control device when the sensor signal persists.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/061 (2013.01); A61G 2203/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10018578 C1 20010621; EP 1145698 A2 20011017; EP 1145698 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ULRICH ALBER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI