Global Patent Index - EP 1145948 B1

EP 1145948 B1 2002-12-11 - Two-hand surfboard for bodysurfing

Title (en)

Two-hand surfboard for bodysurfing

Title (de)

Zweihändiges Gleitbrett für das Bodysurfing

Title (fr)

Planche de surf corporelle à deux mains

Publication

EP 1145948 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202631 A

Priority

IT MI20000790 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1145948A1] A device for bodysurfing, comprising a floating body (1) which has the general shape of a surfboard or windsurf in miniature and with different proportions, and which further comprises a system of directional fins (two lateral forward fins (2a) plus one central rear fin (2b)) placed in the tail area of its bottom surface (7), a gadget for the tying of a security cord (3) placed in the tail area of its top surface (12), and a handling system (4,13) comprising a single over-raised tubular handle (4) which runs across its top surface (12) from side to side. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 35/79

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/79 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/7933 (2013.01); B63B 35/7906 (2013.01); B63B 35/7926 (2013.01); B63B 2035/7903 (2013.01); B63B 2231/50 (2013.01); B63B 2231/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1145948 A1 20011017; EP 1145948 B1 20021211; DE 60000966 D1 20030123; DE 60000966 T2 20031204; ES 2191593 T3 20030916; IT MI20000790 A1 20011011; IT MI20000790 D0 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100722

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090708

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060721

2006-07-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060721

2005-07-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050704

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-07-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040721

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191593 T3

2003-07-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000966 20030123

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE PT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IE PT

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE PT

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI