Global Patent Index - EP 1146061 A4

EP 1146061 A4 2003-06-18 - MICHAEL ADDITION TYPE URETHANE-UREA RESIN, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, COATING MATERIAL FOR FORMING INK-RECEIVING LAYER, AND RECORDING MATERIAL

Title (en)

MICHAEL ADDITION TYPE URETHANE-UREA RESIN, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, COATING MATERIAL FOR FORMING INK-RECEIVING LAYER, AND RECORDING MATERIAL

Title (de)

URETHAN-HARNSTOFF-HARZ DURCH MICHAEL-ADDITION, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN, HAFTKLEBER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DESSELBEN, BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER TINTENABSORBIERENDEN SCHICHT UND AUFNAHMEGERÄT

Title (fr)

RESINE URETHANE/UREE DE TYPE ADDITION DE MICHAEL, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ; ADHESIF SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ; MATERIAU DE REVETEMENT POUR FORMER UNE COUCHE D'ABSORPTION D'ENCRE, ET MATERIAU D'ENREGISTREMENT

Publication

EP 1146061 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00956820 A

Priority

  • JP 0005890 W
  • JP 24243599 A
  • JP 30191999 A
  • JP 2000237846 A
  • JP 2000237857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1146061A1] This invention provides a Michael addition type urethane urea made from starting materials including a polyol (a), a polyisocyanate (b), a polyamine (c) and an unsaturated compound (d), and comprising a bonded portion represented by the following formula (1-1) or (1-2): <CHEM> <CHEM> (where R<3> represents a monovalent organic group, X represents a hydrogen atom or an alkyl group having 1 to 3 carbon atoms and R<4> represents a hydrogen atom or a monovalent organic group).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 18/83; C08G 18/32; C09J 175/00; C08G 18/08; C08G 18/10; C08G 18/12; C08G 18/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/08 (2006.01); C08G 18/10 (2006.01); C08G 18/12 (2006.01); C08G 18/32 (2006.01); C08G 18/38 (2006.01); C08G 18/40 (2006.01); C08G 18/42 (2006.01); C08G 18/48 (2006.01); C08G 18/66 (2006.01); C09D 175/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 175/02 (2013.01); C08G 18/0814 (2013.01); C08G 18/0823 (2013.01); C08G 18/10 (2013.01); C08G 18/12 (2013.01); C08G 18/3225 (2013.01); C08G 18/3821 (2013.01); C08G 18/4018 (2013.01); C08G 18/4277 (2013.01); C08G 18/4854 (2013.01); C08G 18/6692 (2013.01); C08G 18/73 (2013.01); C08G 18/755 (2013.01); C08G 2170/40 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08G 18/10 + C08G 18/3821
  2. C08G 18/10 + C08G 18/3271
  3. C08G 18/12 + C08G 18/3821
  4. C08G 18/12 + C08G 18/3271

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0115072 A1 19840808 - BASF AG [DE]
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199046, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A26, AN 1990-346091, XP002238720
  • See also references of WO 0116203A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1146061 A1 20011017; EP 1146061 A4 20030618; US 2003225239 A1 20031204; WO 0116203 A1 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 18/83 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 18/32 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09J 175/00 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 18/08 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 18/10 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 18/12 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08G 18/40 B

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE