Global Patent Index - EP 1146194 A3

EP 1146194 A3 2002-09-18 - Profiled door, window or the like

Title (en)

Profiled door, window or the like

Title (de)

Profilierte Tür, Fenster oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Porte, fenêtre ou produit similaire profilé

Publication

EP 1146194 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01201266 A

Priority

BE 200000253 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1146194A2] Profiled door, window or the like, substantially consisting of a frame (1) in which a panel (2) or a second frame is provided and whereby the transition between said frame (1) and the panel (2) or second frame is formed by transition profiles (4) having decorative mouldings, characterized in that this profiled door, window or the like is made of a synthetic material, a metal or the like, whereby said transition profiles (4) are resting freely against the frame (1) and/or the panel (2) or said second frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/72; E06B 3/58; E06B 3/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01); E06B 3/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/72 (2013.01); E06B 3/5892 (2013.01); E06B 3/7001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1146194 A2 20011017; EP 1146194 A3 20020918; BE 1013382 A3 20011204; HU 0101452 A2 20030828; PL 347018 A1 20011022

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070813

2006-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060823

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030116

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI