Global Patent Index - EP 1146776 A3

EP 1146776 A3 2001-12-12 - Radiant heater, particularly for glass-ceramic plate

Title (en)

Radiant heater, particularly for glass-ceramic plate

Title (de)

Strahlungsheizkörper, insbesondere für ein Glaskeramik-Kochfeld

Title (fr)

Corps de chauffe rayonnant, en particulier pour plaque vitro-céramique

Publication

EP 1146776 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01108581 A

Priority

DE 10018816 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1146776A2] The heating body has main and bounding auxiliary heating zones, each with has at least one associated electrical heating element and defined by an edge bounding the radiation surface of the associated heating element. The main heating zone has an incandescent radiator heating element. The edge of the main zone forms the edge of the radiation heating body in at least one section containing the incandescent radiator leadthrough. The heating body has a main heating zone and a bounding auxiliary heating zone. Each zone has at least one associated electrical heating element and is defined by an edge bounding the radiation surface of the associated heating element. The main heating zone contains an incandescent radiator (21) as its heating element. The edge (16,12) of the main heating zone forms the edge of the radiation heating body (11) in at least one section whereby the incandescent radiator leadthrough through the edge is arranged in this section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/742 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1146776 A2 20011017; EP 1146776 A3 20011212; DE 10018816 A1 20011031

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-10-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI