Global Patent Index - EP 1146976 B1

EP 1146976 B1 2002-09-18 - DEVICE FOR POURING CAST IRON INTO PIG MOULDS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR POURING CAST IRON INTO PIG MOULDS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINGIESSEN VON GUSSEISEN IN MASSELGIESSFORMEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COULEE DE FONTE DANS DES MOULES DE COULEE DE GUEUSES

Publication

EP 1146976 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00901080 A

Priority

  • DE 19902441 A
  • EP 0000112 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19902441A1] A pig casting machine comprises a melt distributor (6) having a melt reception portion (7) connected to a pouring portion (9) by a bottom opening (11) in a partition wall (12). A pig casting machine has an endless belt (2) for transporting pig moulds (1) between a casting station (3) and an emptying station, the casting station comprising a distributor (6) having a basin portion (7) which holds melt (8) received from a transport vessel (4) and which communicates with a pouring portion (9), having one or more pouring tubes (10), by means of a lower connection opening (11) in a common siphon-like partition wall (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19902441 A1 20000727; AU 2106900 A 20000807; EP 1146976 A1 20011024; EP 1146976 B1 20020918; WO 0043151 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2004-01-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040108

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1146976E

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000522 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2002-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR POURING CAST IRON INTO PIG MOULDS

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE