Global Patent Index - EP 1147018 B1

EP 1147018 B1 2003-06-25 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING PERSONALIZED COUPONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING PERSONALIZED COUPONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PERSONALISIERTEN COUPONS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION DE COUPONS PERSONNALISES

Publication

EP 1147018 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00901663 A

Priority

  • FR 0000196 W
  • FR 9901023 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2789014A1] The installation for producing personalized coupons comprises a supply station (110) for base coupons (C), a personalization station (120) for said base coupons(C) and a cutting station (170) for the base coupons (C). A system for transporting the base coupons (C) between the various workstations (110, 120, 170) comprises a link chain (1) that is driven by pinion gears(2) that are motorized in an indexed manner, in addition to a number of squeezing devices (5) that are mounted with a constant thread on the links of the chain (1), cooperating with opening /closing means (37) that are placed in a fixed position (37) so that each squeezing device can individually grasp a base coupon (C), transport said base coupon (C) between the workstations and discharge the base coupon(C) in a collector station (180) for the finished or semi-finished products. Each squeezing device (5) includes a pair of jaws that clasp an edge area of the base coupon (C) at at least two points that are distant from each other in the direction in which the chain is displaced, in addition to external stops that are joined to one jaw or the other for lateral positioning of the base coupon thus clasped.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/10; B65H 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 15/10 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 25/40 (2014.10); B42D 25/00 (2014.10); B42D 25/25 (2014.10); B65H 29/00 (2013.01); B65H 29/005 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1084 (2013.01); Y10T 156/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2789014 A1 20000804; FR 2789014 B1 20010420; AT 243623 T 20030715; AU 2299000 A 20000818; AU 764028 B2 20030807; CA 2361290 A1 20000803; CA 2361290 C 20051108; CN 1177702 C 20041201; CN 1337906 A 20020227; DE 60003522 D1 20030731; DE 60003522 T2 20040429; EP 1147018 A1 20011024; EP 1147018 B1 20030625; IL 144596 A 20060611; IL 144596 D0 20020523; JP 2002537139 A 20021105; US 6652698 B1 20031125; WO 0044572 A1 20000803; ZA 200106127 B 20020819

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171205

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171205

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171204

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171205

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-12-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-07 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080128

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-12-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-09-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003522 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IDENTIS SA

2003-02-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IDENTIS SA

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TISSERAND, JACQUES

2003-02-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TISSERAND, GEORGES

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE