Global Patent Index - EP 1147297 B1

EP 1147297 B1 2002-11-20 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH LIQUID-COOLED CYLINDERS

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH LIQUID-COOLED CYLINDERS

Title (de)

BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT FLÜSSIGKEITSGEKÜHLTEN ZYLINDERN

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A CYLINDRES REFROIDIS PAR LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1147297 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99962241 A

Priority

  • DE 19902286 A
  • EP 9909632 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19902286A1] The engine has at least two liquid-cooled cylinders (1-4) in a block (13) arranged in series with their cylinder tubes (5-8) in annular, communicating cooling chambers (9-12) with flowing coolant in a cooling system, whereby a first flow component (15) of the cylinder tube for the first cylinder (1) flows on one side and a second component (16) on the other side. A parameter dependent on the flow speed of the coolant for the first and/or second component of flow is determined and the flow speeds of the components (15,16) are controlled depending on it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 3/02; F01P 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/02 (2006.01); F01P 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 7/14 (2013.01); F01P 3/02 (2013.01); F01P 2003/024 (2013.01); F01P 2003/028 (2013.01); F01P 2007/146 (2013.01); F01P 2025/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19902286 A1 20000727; EP 1147297 A1 20011024; EP 1147297 B1 20021120; WO 0043649 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2005-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051231

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051201

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1147297E

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-21 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021120

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903500 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE