Global Patent Index - EP 1147303 B1

EP 1147303 B1 2002-09-25 - LIGHT BOX PISTON

Title (en)

LIGHT BOX PISTON

Title (de)

LEICHTER KASTENKOLBEN

Title (fr)

PISTON LEGER EN FORME DE CAISSON

Publication

EP 1147303 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99968311 A

Priority

  • DE 9904038 W
  • DE 19903278 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19903278A1] The invention aims at reducing the weight of a box piston having a running surface, the width of which in the pressure side is different from the width of the running surface on the counterpressure side. To this end, the piston has at least one bent channel that is cast using bent sleeves and is located at least partly above the bolt hubs with a tapering cross section extending approximately in the direction of pressure-counterpressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/22; B22C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/10 (2006.01); F01P 3/10 (2006.01); F02F 3/00 (2006.01); F02F 3/22 (2006.01); F16J 1/00 (2006.01); F16J 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/101 (2013.01); F02F 3/22 (2013.01); F02F 3/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19903278 A1 20000803; BR 9916979 A 20011106; EP 1147303 A1 20011024; EP 1147303 B1 20020925; JP 2003518215 A 20030603; US 6467396 B1 20021022; WO 0045038 A1 20000803

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141215

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141215

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141215

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902895

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1147303E

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902895 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020327

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010623

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE