Global Patent Index - EP 1147664 A4

EP 1147664 A4 2003-06-25 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CARRYING DATA WITH A VIDEO SIGNAL SO THAT THE DATA IS NOT RECORDED

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CARRYING DATA WITH A VIDEO SIGNAL SO THAT THE DATA IS NOT RECORDED

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG MIT VIDEOSIGNALEN, SO DASS DIE DATEN NICHT GESPEICHERT WERDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'ACHEMINER DES DONNEES AVEC UN SIGNAL VIDEO DE MANIERE A NE PAS ENREGISTRER LES DONNEES

Publication

EP 1147664 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00904592 A

Priority

  • US 0001964 W
  • US 11727399 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044167A1] A method and apparatus for modifying a video signal to allow it to carry encoded data which is detectable at a suitably compliant receiver (18) but is not recorded by a conventional video recorder (13). One application is to carry a descrambling key to prevent useful recording (but not viewing) of a scrambled television signal since the key will not be recorded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/167; G11B 20/00; H04N 5/913

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/76 (2006.01); H04N 5/91 (2006.01); H04N 5/913 (2006.01); H04N 5/93 (2006.01); H04N 7/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/081 (2006.01); H04N 7/169 (2011.01); H04N 7/171 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/913 (2013.01); H04N 7/1693 (2013.01); H04N 7/1713 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044167 A1 20000727; AU 2632300 A 20000807; EP 1147664 A1 20011024; EP 1147664 A4 20030625; JP 2002535929 A 20021022; JP 3676679 B2 20050727

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100818

2009-05-13 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE

- Effective date: 20090226

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030822

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/167 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 5/913 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 11B 20/00 B

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE