Global Patent Index - EP 1147724 A3

EP 1147724 A3 2003-06-04 - Easy grip paint applicator

Title (en)

Easy grip paint applicator

Title (de)

Leicht zu ergreifender Farbauftragegerät

Title (fr)

Applicateur de peinture à préhension facile

Publication

EP 1147724 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01710015 A

Priority

  • US 19321900 P
  • US 26936101 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1147724A2] The present invention comprises an applicator for coatings such as paints, stains, varnish, and other such materials. The applicator may be a brush, foam, or other applicator as conventionally used for such materials. According to the present invention, the handle of the applicator is adapted to be received in the hand of a user when the h and is in a substantially relaxed posture, and supports the hand in the posture. The handle of an applicator made according to the present invention also may include visual or other aids to promote the use of a relaxed hand posture to hold the applicator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/02 (2006.01); B05C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 5/026 (2013.01); A46B 5/02 (2013.01); B05C 17/0205 (2013.01); A46B 2200/202 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1147724 A2 20011024; EP 1147724 A3 20030604; CA 2343475 A1 20010930; US 2003005533 A1 20030109

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOODNORTH, BRIAN E.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BONE, BRIAN C.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DOTY, HEATH A.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RITZEL, KENT P.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNGAR, WILLIAM DEAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FORTNER, CHRISTINA L.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAWLEY, JONATHAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FARNUM, RON C.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALTHEIMER, DANA W.

2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI