Global Patent Index - EP 1147836 A3

EP 1147836 A3 2001-12-19 - Casting mould consisting of external mould parts and cores of moulding material inserted into these parts

Title (en)

Casting mould consisting of external mould parts and cores of moulding material inserted into these parts

Title (de)

Giessform, umfassend Aussenformteile und darin eingelegte Formstoffkerne

Title (fr)

Moule comprenant pièces de forme extérieure ansi que noyaux en sable disposés dans celles-ci

Publication

EP 1147836 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01108815 A

Priority

DE 10019310 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1147836A2] The casting mould (11) has outer mould parts (12-14) and an inner core (15), which form a casting cavity along with a closing cover core (16). The inner core is made in several layers formed one on top of the other, which are clamped between the outer mould parts and the cover core. The outer mould parts have a base plate (12) and several movable side parts (13,14) and are formed as reusable mould parts. An Independent claim is included for a method for using the device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 23/00; B22C 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2006.01); B22C 9/00 (2006.01); B22C 9/06 (2006.01); B22C 9/10 (2006.01); B22D 23/00 (2006.01); B22D 27/08 (2006.01); B22D 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/103 (2013.01); B22C 9/06 (2013.01); B22D 23/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1147836 A2 20011024; EP 1147836 A3 20011219; EP 1147836 B1 20041013; AT 279281 T 20041015; AU 3708801 A 20011025; AU 750071 B2 20020711; BR 0101501 A 20011120; CA 2344237 A1 20011019; CA 2344237 C 20050215; CN 1181941 C 20041229; CN 1323667 A 20011128; CZ 20011316 A3 20020515; CZ 303141 B6 20120502; DE 10019310 C1 20011025; ES 2231332 T3 20050516; HU 0101573 A2 20011228; HU 0101573 A3 20020228; HU 0101573 D0 20010628; HU 226279 B1 20080728; JP 2001353555 A 20011225; JP 3634766 B2 20050330; MX PA01003905 A 20040531; NO 20011906 A 20011022; NO 20011906 D0 20010418; PL 198254 B1 20080630; PL 347116 A1 20011022; RU 2217263 C2 20031127; SK 285698 B6 20070607; SK 5212001 A3 20020806; US 2002134525 A1 20020926; US 6662857 B2 20031216; ZA 200103120 B 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NEMAK LINZ GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HYDRO ALUMINIUM MANDL&BERGER GES. M.B.H., LINZ, AT

- Document: DE 50104068

- Effective date: 20110317

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080408

2008-12-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HYDRO ALUMINIUM MANDL&BERGER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20050430

2007-04-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-01-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-04-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060407

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM MANDL&BERGER GMBH

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231332 T3

2005-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-04-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-24 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050324

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-03-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-02-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2005-01-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050113

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104068 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM MANDL&BERGER GMBH

2004-09-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CASTING MOULD COMPRISING OUTER MOULD PARTS AND CORES OF MOULDING MATERIAL INSERTED INTO THESE PARTS

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030818

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20020227

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020227

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI