Global Patent Index - EP 1147982 A3

EP 1147982 A3 2001-12-05 - Light filling for the construction of elevated deck areas on ships, and method of construction

Title (en)

Light filling for the construction of elevated deck areas on ships, and method of construction

Title (de)

Leichte Füllung für die Aufbau erhöhte Deckoberfläche in Schiffe, und Bauverfahren

Title (fr)

Remplissage léger pour la formation d'îlots surélevés à bord des navires et procédé pour sa réalistaion

Publication

EP 1147982 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 01105287 A

Priority

IT GE20000059 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1147982A2] Elements (10) are standing on four legs (17) on the ground (22) and are placed side by side in the free space between side boards (11). The elements are then covered by a non combustible material and a glass wool mesh so that to form an horizontal surface. The non combustible material is mixed with a binder and will become solid once dry.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 29/00; B63B 3/68; B63B 5/06; B63B 29/02; E04F 15/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 29/00 (2006.01); E04B 5/36 (2006.01); E04B 5/48 (2006.01); E04F 15/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/48 (2013.01); B63B 29/00 (2013.01); E04B 5/326 (2013.01); E04B 5/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1147982 A2 20011024; EP 1147982 A3 20011205; EP 1147982 B1 20031105; EP 1147982 B9 20041110; DE 60101114 D1 20031211; DE 60101114 T2 20040826; IT 1314524 B1 20021218; IT GE20000059 A1 20011019; IT GE20000059 D0 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2005-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-10-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60101114 P 20031211

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR

2003-11-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031105

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020603

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63B 29/00 A, 7B 63B 29/02 B, 7B 63B 3/68 B, 7B 63B 5/06 B, 7E 04F 15/024 B

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI