Global Patent Index - EP 1147999 A3

EP 1147999 A3 2002-09-18 - Safety device for a sliding lid of a movable refuse receptacle which can be automatically emptied by a refuse vehicle

Title (en)

Safety device for a sliding lid of a movable refuse receptacle which can be automatically emptied by a refuse vehicle

Title (de)

Sicherungsvorrichtung für einen Schiebedeckel eines verfahrbaren und mittels eines Müllfahrzeugs automatisch entleerbaren Müllbehälters

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour un couvercle coulissant d'une poubelle mobile qui est automatiquement vidable par un véhicule à ordures

Publication

EP 1147999 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01108826 A

Priority

DE 10019925 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1147999A2] The lock (8) for the lid of a wheeled refuse bin fastens it when the bin is upright but allows it to open when tilted for emptying. It consists of a lever (9) with a latch (19) which cooperates with a rod (10) mounted on the top (7) of the lid. The lever is mounted eccentrically on a pivot (22) and is biased towards the locked position by its own weight and optionally by a spring (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 1/1623 (2013.01); B65F 1/1615 (2013.01); B65F 2001/1669 (2013.01); B65F 2001/1692 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 0979786 A1 20000216 - STREUBER SULO EISENWERK F [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1147999 A2 20011024; EP 1147999 A3 20020918; EP 1147999 B1 20051221; AT 313498 T 20060115; DE 10019925 A1 20011025; DK 1147999 T3 20060501; ES 2256107 T3 20060716

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180418

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108422

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50108422

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090409

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090409

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2009-12-07 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUDHAUS G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *PLASTIC OMNIUM SYSTEMES URBAINS

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SULO UMWELTTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060409

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080408

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256107 T3

2006-05-29 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060401017

2006-05-22 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060522

2006-05-01 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-03-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060321

2006-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108422 P 20060126

2006-01-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUDHAUS GMBH & CO

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLASTIC OMNIUM SYSTEMES URBAINS SA

2001-11-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SULO UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI