Global Patent Index - EP 1148144 A3

EP 1148144 A3 2001-12-19 - Leather perching machine

Title (en)

Leather perching machine

Title (de)

Maschine zum Geschmeidigmachen von Leder

Title (fr)

Machine pour l'assouplissement du cuir

Publication

EP 1148144 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01109619 A

Priority

IT VI20000071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1148144A2] An improved perching machine, in particular for softening and stretching industrial hides or the like, comprises at least one first section (5) and at least one second section (5') operationally coupled and located downstream of the first section; each section (5; 5') is formed by at least one pair of mutually facing conveyor belts (6, 7; 6', 7') for retaining and conveying the hides (P) and by at least one pair of plates (10, 12; 11, 13; 10', 12'; 11', 13') substantially parallel to the belts (6, 7; 6', 7') and acting on opposite sides thereof for softening and stretching the hides. The pair of conveyor belts (6', 7') of the downstream section has a feed speed (V') greater than that (V) of the pair of belts (6, 7) of the upstream section (5). Each section (5; 5') comprises independent motors (20, 20') operating a respective pair of conveyor belts (6, 7; 6', 7') so as to impart varied speeds (V', V) thereto. The ratio (V'/V) between the feed speed of the pair of belts of the downstream section and the speed of the pair of conveyor belts of the upstream section is between 1 and 4 and preferably equal to about 1.2. The advantage of exerting a greater stretching force on the hides in the longitudinal direction when passing from one section to the next one is obtained. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14B 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1148144 A2 20011024; EP 1148144 A3 20011219; EP 1148144 B1 20040707; IT 1315318 B1 20030210; IT VI20000071 A1 20011019

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-08-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT

2002-10-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: IT

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020514

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): IT

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI