Global Patent Index - EP 1148161 A3

EP 1148161 A3 2002-12-04 - Method for making knitwear with several knitting levels

Title (en)

Method for making knitwear with several knitting levels

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Gestricken mit mehreren Strickebenen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de tricot à plusieurs niveaux de tricotage

Publication

EP 1148161 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01105515 A

Priority

DE 10019987 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1148161A2] To form an additional layer of knitting, appropriate stitches (7) hanging on the knitting needles (3), are taken over from them, by allocated transfer components (5). Either the transfer component assembly, with the hanging stitches, or the associated needle bed, is displaced by about one half of a needle division (Tlg). Each transfer component is then located with clearance from them, in gaps between the needles. Needles freed of stitches, take over stitches from the opposite needle bed, forming stitches for another plane of knitting. After completion of knitting for the other knitting plane, the stitches are again hung back onto the opposite needle bed. The transfer component assembly or associated needle bed, is reset through half a needle division, bringing the transfer components back again over the needles of their associated needle bed. Stitches held by the transfer components are again taken over by the needles of the needle bed and further stitches are formed for the original knitting plane. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding knitted fabric product in the form of rounded tubular ribbing. Preferred features: To transfer stitches hanging on needles required to form the further layer of knitting, onto the transfer components (5), these stitches are placed by outward displacement- and/or retraction movements onto the needle latches, or slides in the case of compound needles. The transfer components are introduced into the stitches, withdrawing the needles, leaving the stitches hanging only on the transfer components. By needle advance and retraction, the stitches are placed on the closed or opened needle latches. When using compound needles, the stitches are placed over the closed slides, following an open advance and closed retraction of the compound needles. Knits produced, include rounded tubular ribbing, optionally with Jacquard pattern and/or knitted-in pockets. Plain knitting and a lapel are produced, the lapel being formed as a parallel section of knitting on the plain knitting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/00 (2006.01); D04B 1/22 (2006.01); D04B 7/00 (2006.01); D04B 7/28 (2006.01); D04B 35/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D04B 35/18 (2013.01); D10B 2403/0333 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1148161 A2 20011024; EP 1148161 A3 20021204; EP 1148161 B1 20050413; CN 1167840 C 20040922; CN 1320735 A 20011107; DE 10019987 A1 20011025; ES 2237503 T3 20050801; JP 2002020951 A 20020123; US 2001037664 A1 20011108; US 6397639 B2 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100306

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090307

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090307

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090309

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-03-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060310

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237503 T3

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50105879 P 20050519

2005-05-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-08-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI