Global Patent Index - EP 1148169 A3

EP 1148169 A3 2002-11-06 - Clothes drying or similar machine provided with conductometric moisture control

Title (en)

Clothes drying or similar machine provided with conductometric moisture control

Title (de)

Wäschetrockner oder Dergleiche , wobei die Feuchtigkeit durch eine Leitfähigkeitmessung gesteuert ist

Title (fr)

Sèche-linge ou machine similaire avec contrôle de l'humidité par mesure de la conductivité

Publication

EP 1148169 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01103287 A

Priority

IT PN20000023 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1148169A2] The machine is provided with a conductometric control system comprising a pair of electrodes (4) adapted to contact the clothes being dried and to correspondingly drive a programme sequence control unit (6) with a signal that is indicative of the residual moisture contents of the clothes. The electrodes (4) drive said programme sequence control unit (6) through a radio-frequency transceiver comprising a transmitter (7) of said signal, which is arranged in correspondence of the drum (2) and is electrically connected to the electrodes (4), and a receiver (12) of said signal, which is arranged in a stationary position on the outer casing (1) of the machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 58/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/28 (2013.01); D06F 2058/2838 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1148169 A2 20011024; EP 1148169 A3 20021106; IT PN20000023 A1 20011018

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI