Global Patent Index - EP 1148211 A3

EP 1148211 A3 2002-11-06 - Valve rotating device

Title (en)

Valve rotating device

Title (de)

Ventildrehvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rotation de soupape

Publication

EP 1148211 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01109652 A

Priority

DE 10020071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1148211A2] The device has body with central bore, containing valve cone parts, and a valve spring cover with spring contact surface (2). Elements (7,8,9,10,11) between cover (1) and body (3) transmit the rotary spring movement occurring during relief movement of the spring, from the cover to the body. The cover has a toothed rim (8) concentric to the valve axis (19), with one-sided lock teething, which engages with locking ring (9). The ring is moveable in longitudinal valve direction and is connected to the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1148211 A2 20011024; EP 1148211 A3 20021106; EP 1148211 B1 20040804; DE 10020071 A1 20011025

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070419

2006-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-04-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060421

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-04-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060403

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041210

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50103061 P 20040909

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030411

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI