Global Patent Index - EP 1148246 A3

EP 1148246 A3 2002-11-20 - Scroll compressor and scroll-type pressure transformer

Title (en)

Scroll compressor and scroll-type pressure transformer

Title (de)

Spiralverdichter und Spiraldrucktransformatoranlage

Title (fr)

Compresseur à spirales et appareil convertisseur de pression à spirales

Publication

EP 1148246 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01303409 A

Priority

  • JP 2000118467 A
  • JP 2000123920 A
  • JP 2000208326 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1148246A2] A scroll compressor comprises a stationary scroll 122 fixed to a casing 121, a stator 123 fixed to the casing 121, bearing supports 126 and 127 fixed to the casing 121, a rotary shaft 125 rotatably supported by the bearing supports 126 and 127 through bearings 128 and 129, a rotor 124 fixed to the rotary shaft 125, a hollow orbiting shaft 130 eccentrically and rotatably supported by the rotary shaft 125, a mounting member 133 fixed within the hollow orbiting shaft 130, an orbiting scroll 135 mounted to a mounting portion 134 of the mounting member 133, a hollow orbiting plate 136 fixed to the lower portion of the hollow orbiting shaft 130, an Oldham's ring 137 provided between the bearing support 127 and a hollow orbiting plate 136 and having protrusions 138 and 139, grooves 140 and 141 formed on the bearing support 127 and the hollow orbiting plate 136, the protrusions 138 and 139 being engaged with the grooves 140 and 141, and a suction pipe 142 and a discharge pipe 143 connected to the stationary scroll 122.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/02 (2006.01); F04C 23/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/0085 (2013.01); F04C 18/0223 (2013.01); F04C 23/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1148246 A2 20011024; EP 1148246 A3 20021120; US 2001033801 A1 20011025; US 2002141892 A1 20021003; US 2002150491 A1 20021017; US 2002150492 A1 20021017

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI