Global Patent Index - EP 1148884 A4

EP 1148884 A4 2003-06-11 - GRADUATED PROGESTIN CONTRACEPTIVE

Title (en)

GRADUATED PROGESTIN CONTRACEPTIVE

Title (de)

Verhütungsmittel mit gradiertem Progestin

Title (fr)

CONTRACEPTIF PROGESTATIF GRADUE

Publication

EP 1148884 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99957497 A

Priority

  • US 9925705 W
  • US 19014698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0028995A1] Contraceptive methods and delivery systems involving few undesirable side effects during administration are based on novel multi-phasic norethindrone/ethinyl estradiol combinations, wherein the amount of norethindrone is increased substantially stepwise over the phases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/56; A61K 31/565

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/56 (2013.01); A61K 31/567 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 0028995A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0028995 A1 20000525; AU 1518900 A 20000605; EP 1148884 A1 20011031; EP 1148884 A4 20030611

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2004-01-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/56 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/565 B

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE