Global Patent Index - EP 1148959 B1

EP 1148959 B1 2002-11-27 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOS HORIZONTAL CASTING, ESPECIALLY OF STRIPS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTINUOS HORIZONTAL CASTING, ESPECIALLY OF STRIPS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM HORIZONTALEN STRANGGIESSEN, INSBESONDERE VON BÄNDERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LA COULEE EN CONTINU HORIZONTALE, EN PARTICULIER LA COULEE DE FEUILLARDS

Publication

EP 1148959 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00902476 A

Priority

  • AT 0000022 W
  • AT 11499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044515A1] Disclosed is a device for continuos horizontal casting, especially of strips, comprising a mold (2) that can be attached to a tank for receiving the molten metal, wherein the casting gap (3) which is fitted with a graphite lining and is formed between two cooling bodies (4, 5) forms a shaping solidification section (3a) and a secondary cooling section (3b) attached thereto. In order to provide advantageous construction conditions, the invention provides that the graphite lining be pressed flatly on the billet (22) in the area of the secondary cooling section (3b) by applying prestress.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044515 A1 20000803; AT 228408 T 20021215; AT 407845 B 20010625; AT A11499 A 20001115; DE 50000817 D1 20030109; EP 1148959 A1 20011031; EP 1148959 B1 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-14 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20080909

2007-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-01-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060111

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS MEER GMBHDEMAG TECHNICA

- Effective date: 20030820

2003-09-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1148959E

2003-05-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021127

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-01-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030128

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000817 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228408 T 20021215

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE