Global Patent Index - EP 1149066 A4

EP 1149066 A4 2002-09-04 - METHOD OF PREPARING ALKYLATED SALICYLAMIDES

Title (en)

METHOD OF PREPARING ALKYLATED SALICYLAMIDES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ALKYLIERTER SALICYLAMIDE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SALICYLAMIDES ALKYLES

Publication

EP 1149066 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00911725 A

Priority

  • US 0003189 W
  • US 11920799 P
  • US 12775499 P
  • US 17398999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0046182A1] The present invention relates to a method of preparing an alkylated salicylamide from a protected and activated salicylamide (hereinafter referred to as a "protected/activated salicylamide"). The method comprises the steps of (a) alkylating the protected/activated salicylamide with an alkylating agent to form a protected/activated alkylated salicylamide, and (b) deprotecting and deactivating the protected/activated alkylated salicylamide, simultaneously or in any order, to form the alkylated salicylamide. The alkylated salicylamides prepared by this method are suitable for use in compositions for delivering active agents via oral or other routes of administration to animals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 229/14; C07C 231/00; C07D 265/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 47/18 (2006.01); C07C 231/00 (2006.01); C07C 233/51 (2006.01); C07C 235/24 (2006.01); C07C 235/34 (2006.01); C07C 235/64 (2006.01); C07C 235/74 (2006.01); C07C 271/28 (2006.01); C07C 271/54 (2006.01); C07C 271/58 (2006.01); C07C 275/42 (2006.01); C07C 309/59 (2006.01); C07C 317/44 (2006.01); C07D 239/91 (2006.01); C07D 239/94 (2006.01); C07D 239/96 (2006.01); C07D 265/26 (2006.01); C07D 311/18 (2006.01); C07D 317/68 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); C07C 235/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0014 (2013.01); A61K 9/0031 (2013.01); A61K 47/18 (2013.01); A61K 47/183 (2013.01); C07C 231/00 (2013.01); C07C 233/51 (2013.01); C07C 235/24 (2013.01); C07C 235/34 (2013.01); C07C 235/64 (2013.01); C07C 235/74 (2013.01); C07C 271/28 (2013.01); C07C 271/54 (2013.01); C07C 271/58 (2013.01); C07C 275/42 (2013.01); C07C 309/59 (2013.01); C07C 317/44 (2013.01); C07D 239/91 (2013.01); C07D 239/94 (2013.01); C07D 239/96 (2013.01); C07D 265/26 (2013.01); C07D 311/18 (2013.01); C07D 317/68 (2013.01); A61K 9/2013 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 231/00 + C07C 235/58

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 2835668 A 19580520 - SHAPIRO SEYMOUR L, et al
  • [A] GB 1069367 A 19670517 - ASPRO NICHOLAS LTD
  • [XY] PALAGNIANO F ET AL: "SYNTHESIS, STABILITY AND ANTICONVULSANT ACTIVITY OF TWO NEW GABA PRODRUGS", PHARMAZIE, VEB VERLAG VOLK UND GESUNDHEIT. BERLIN, DD, vol. 4, no. 52, 1997, pages 272 - 276, XP001084051, ISSN: 0031-7144
  • See also references of WO 0046182A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0046182 A1 20000810; AT 309197 T 20051115; AU 3357800 A 20000825; CA 2361716 A1 20000810; CA 2361716 C 20090428; DE 60023841 D1 20051215; DE 60023841 T2 20060524; EP 1149066 A1 20011031; EP 1149066 A4 20020904; EP 1149066 B1 20051109; US 2002013497 A1 20020131; US 6399798 B2 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180207

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-06-29 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 06/42 - 3.2.

2012-06-29 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 06/52 - 3.2.

2010-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2006-12-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-11-15 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-08-25 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2006-07-28 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2006-06-09 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2006-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-04-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060410

2006-03-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060220

2006-02-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-02-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-02-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-02-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060206

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023841 P 20051215

2005-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-11-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051109

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07C 229/14 A, 7C 07D 265/26 B, 7C 07C 231/00 B

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI