Global Patent Index - EP 1149188 B1

EP 1149188 B1 2002-09-11 - HIGH-STRENGTH LOW-ALLOY STEEL ANODES FOR ALUMINIUM ELECTROWINNING CELLS

Title (en)

HIGH-STRENGTH LOW-ALLOY STEEL ANODES FOR ALUMINIUM ELECTROWINNING CELLS

Title (de)

ANODEN AUS HOCHFESTEM, NIEDRIGLEGIERTEM STAHL FÜR ZELLEN ZUR ALUMINIUM-SCHMELZELEKTROLYSE

Title (fr)

ANODES EN ACIER HAUTE RESISTANCE FAIBLEMENT ALLIE POUR CELLULES D'EXTRACTION ELECTROLYTIQUE DE L'ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 1149188 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00900036 A

Priority

  • IB 0000028 W
  • IB 9900015 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0040783A1] An anode of a cell for the electrowinning of aluminium comprises a low-carbon high-strength low-alloy (HSLA) steel body or layer whose surface is oxidised to form a coherent and adherent outer iron oxide-based layer the surface of which is electrochemically active for the evolution of oxygen. The iron oxide-based layer has a low solubility in the molten electrolyte. During use, the thickness of the iron oxide-based layer is such as to reduce or prevent diffusion of oxygen from the electrochemically active surface into the steel body or layer. During cell operation, the anode may be maintained dimensionally stable by saturating the electrolyte with anode constituents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 3/12; C25C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0040783 A1 20000713; AU 1793200 A 20000724; CA 2360094 A1 20000713; CA 2360094 C 20051129; DE 60000436 D1 20021017; DE 60000436 T2 20030515; EP 1149188 A1 20011031; EP 1149188 B1 20020911; ES 2180506 T3 20030216

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090112

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090112

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090110

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090110

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080115

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-07-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MOLTECH INVENT S.A.

2003-07-04 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180506 T3

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000436 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI