Global Patent Index - EP 1149222 B1

EP 1149222 B1 2003-06-04 - ARRANGEMENT FOR REVERSIBLE GLAZING-IN OF AN OPEN SPACE

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT FOR REVERSIBLE GLAZING-IN OF AN OPEN SPACE

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG FÜR EIN REVERSIBLES VERGLASEN EINES OFFENEN RAUMES

Title (fr)

ARRANGEMENT POUR VITRER DE MANIERE REVERSIBLE UN ESPACE A L'AIR LIBRE

Publication

EP 1149222 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99965680 A

Priority

  • SE 9902461 W
  • SE 9804540 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0039426A1] The invention relates to an arrangement (100) for reversible glazing-in of an open space, with at least one covering unit (102) carried on roller elements (103, 104, 105) between guide rails (106, 107). When in a predetermined position, each covering unit (102) is able to perform a pivoting motion while being arrested from horizontal transport by a parking station (112, 113). One or several of the covering units (102) comprise(s) a third roller element (105), wherein all three roller elements (103, 104, 105) comprise spherical shapes or truncated spherical shapes. The guide rails (106, 107) comprise substantially tubular profiles (114) having inner surfaces which partially enclose the three roller elements (103, 104, 105) during the horizontal transport and at least the first (103) and the second (104) roller element during the pivoting motion. The first and/or second hinge device comprises a recess and/or a protuberance (116, 117), arranged for receiving or being inserted in, and for cooperating with at least one protuberance and/or at least one recess (118, 119) of the parking station during the pivoting motion. The invention is implemented in connection with open spaces such as balconies, terraces, patios and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/46; E04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/58 (2006.01); E06B 3/92 (2006.01); E05D 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/924 (2013.01); E05D 15/0604 (2013.01); E05D 15/58 (2013.01); E05D 15/0621 (2013.01); E05D 15/063 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/688 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/26 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/28 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0039426 A1 20000706; AT 242404 T 20030615; AU 2136700 A 20000731; DE 69908653 D1 20030710; DE 69908653 T2 20040429; DK 1149222 T3 20030929; EP 1149222 A1 20011031; EP 1149222 B1 20030604; ES 2201826 T3 20040316; NO 20013172 A 20010622; NO 20013172 D0 20010622; NO 315573 B1 20030922; PT 1149222 E 20031031; SE 513307 C2 20000821; SE 9804540 D0 19981223; SE 9804540 L 20000624

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-07-31 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161222

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908653

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141223

2016-02-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160205

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-09-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 242404 T

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150622

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-29 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150622

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM AB, SE

- Document: AT 242404 T

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-02-20 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130211

2013-02-13 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-01-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: F O PETERSONS GATA 7,421 31 VAESTRA FROELUNDA

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-01-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM A.B.

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-01-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM A.B.

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-01-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: F O PETERSONS GATA 7,421 31 VAESTRA FROELUNDA

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-01-29 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM AB

- Effective date: 20130117

2012-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GLAZING CONSTRUCTION LTD., MT

2012-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NOVA GLAZING LIMITED, MT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LMV ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM I SVERIGE AB, SE

2012-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GLAZING CONSTRUCTION LTD., MT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOVA GLAZING LIMITED, MT

2012-11-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LMV ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM I SVERIGE AB, KULLAVIK, SE

- Document: DE 69908653

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-11-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908653

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DR. SOLF & ZAPF, DE

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-11-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908653

- Representative's name: PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE DR. SOLF & ZAPF, DE

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-09-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908653

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DR. SOLF & ZAPF, DE

2012-07-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120628 AND 20120704

2012-06-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM AB, SE

- Effective date: 20120523

2012-06-04 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM AB, SE

- Effective date: 20120528

2012-05-14 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GLAZING CONSTRUCTION LTD, MT

- Effective date: 20120427

2012-04-20 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NOVA GLAZING LIMITED, MT

- Effective date: 20120413

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: LMV ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM I SVERIGE AB

- Free text: LMV ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM I SVERIGE AB#TORREDSVAEGEN 4080#429 34 KULLAVIK (SE) -TRANSFER TO- LMV ALNOVA BALKONGSYSTEM I SVERIGE AB#TORREDSVAEGEN 4080#429 34 KULLAVIK (SE)

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201826 T3

2003-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-09-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908653 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020621

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI