Global Patent Index - EP 1149365 B1

EP 1149365 B1 2002-09-25 - BANK NOTE CONTAINER FOR CASH DISPENSER

Title (en)

BANK NOTE CONTAINER FOR CASH DISPENSER

Title (de)

BANKNOTENBEHÄLTER FÜR GELDAUSGABEAUTOMATEN

Title (fr)

CAISSON POUR BILLETS DE BANQUE POUR DES DISTRIBUTEURS AUTOMATIQUES DE BILLETS

Publication

EP 1149365 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910526 A

Priority

  • DE 0000320 W
  • DE 19904540 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19904540A1] A bank note container for cash distributors comprising a bottom (12), two parallel side walls (14), a rear wall and a front wall (16), a cover (18) and a press-slider that can be moveably arranged in the lower part of the container (10), parallel to the side walls (14). A switch (52) that controls a display device is arranged on the press-slider, whereby the switching element (56) of said switch cooperates with a switch actuating path (58) that is arranged on the bottom (12) of the container and extends parallel to the direction in which the slider (22) is positioned and defines a switching point between two switching states corresponding to a position of the press-slider that signals the amounts remaining, whereby one state corresponds to a positioning path of the press-slider (22) between a final position close to the rear wall and a position signaling the amounts remaining and the other corresponds to the positioning path of the press-slider (22) between the position that signals the amounts remaining and a final position close to the front wall (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 11/00; B65H 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0036 (2013.01); B65H 1/025 (2013.01); B65H 1/027 (2013.01); B65H 7/04 (2013.01); G07D 11/0012 (2013.01); G07D 11/0045 (2013.01); B65H 2405/311 (2013.01); B65H 2511/152 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2511/30 (2013.01); B65H 2553/22 (2013.01); B65H 2553/25 (2013.01); B65H 2553/81 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/152 + B65H 2220/03
  3. B65H 2511/30 + B65H 2220/03

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19904540 A1 20000817; EP 1149365 A1 20011031; EP 1149365 B1 20020925; US 6622911 B1 20030923; WO 0046763 A1 20000810

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140202

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140202

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000555

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140203

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140202

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50000555

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000555 20021031

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BANK NOTE CONTAINER FOR CASH DISPENSER

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE