Global Patent Index - EP 1149546 A3

EP 1149546 A3 2002-09-04 - Chair obtained by assembling pieces cut out of a plane sheet

Title (en)

Chair obtained by assembling pieces cut out of a plane sheet

Title (de)

Stuhl hergestellt durch Zusammensetzen von aus einer flachen Platte geschnittenen Stücken

Title (fr)

Chaise obtenue par l'assemblage de pièces coupées d'une plaque plane

Publication

EP 1149546 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01109442 A

Priority

IT GE20000015 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1149546A2] A chair obtained out of a square shaped plane sheet (1) by a first symmetrical central cut (2) dividing the two basic component parts (3, 4), each consisting of a horizontal crosspiece (5), a pair of legs (6), and a back support (7), subsequently by a second and a third cut (8, 9) running between the chair legs (6), so as to obtain the seat (10), and the back board (11), finally by two shorter cuts (12, 13), respectively made into the lower center section and the upper center section of the two crosspieces (5) belonging to the basic component parts (3, 4), whereby the chair is obtained by cross intersecting the two shorter cuts (12, 13) of the two crosspieces (5), and by fixing the seat (10), and the back board (11) with suitable joining means (14), respectively on top of the crosspieces (5), and against the back supports (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 3/00; A47C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/021 (2013.01); A47C 4/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1149546 A2 20011031; EP 1149546 A3 20020904; IT 250790 Y1 20031014; IT GE20000015 U1 20011026; IT GE20000015 V0 20000426

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050211

2005-05-04 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20050211

2005-01-19 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040806

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI