Global Patent Index - EP 1149767 B1

EP 1149767 B1 2004-12-22 - Wrapping method and machine for providing a package with a top film

Title (en)

Wrapping method and machine for providing a package with a top film

Title (de)

Methode und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Verpackungen mit Oberfolie

Title (fr)

Méthode et machine pour former un emballage comprenant un film supérieur

Publication

EP 1149767 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01660067 A

Priority

FI 20000865 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1149767A1] A method for providing a package with a top film in a wrapping machine (10), whereby an object (12) to be wrapped is wrapped with thin plastic film band (22). With the wrapping action stopped, a top film is brought over the object by pulling from a roll (31) placed outside the wrapping station (11) a length of top film band (32) into the wrapping station and severing the band to form a top film sheet of a desired length, which is brought to a position above the object. The top film sheet is placed onto the object during the wrapping operation without stopping the wrapping action. The wrapping machine (10) comprises a film fetching apparatus (30) placed in the middle of a wrapping station and having a motion mechanism (35) which can move in a horizontal direction outside the wrapping station and which, being provided with a guide rail (36) and slide (37) mechanism, pulls a top film sheet (33) from a roll to a position above the object. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/02; B65B 11/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/02 (2006.01); B65B 11/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/585 (2013.01); B65B 11/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1149767 A1 20011031; EP 1149767 B1 20041222; DE 60107896 D1 20050127; DE 60107896 T2 20051208; FI 111530 B 20030815; FI 20000865 A0 20000411; FI 20000865 A 20011012

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140411

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140411

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60107896

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140411

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60107896

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130603

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130508

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107896 P 20050127

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI