Global Patent Index - EP 1149794 A3

EP 1149794 A3 2002-11-20 - Multipart reel for coil of wire

Title (en)

Multipart reel for coil of wire

Title (de)

Mehrteilige Spule für Drahtcoil

Title (fr)

Bobine en plusieurs parties pour couronne de fil métallique

Publication

EP 1149794 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01104483 A

Priority

IT MN20000011 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1149794A2] A multipart reel for a coil of wire, comprising: an upper flange (1) with spokes for connection to a first hub (2) which is connected to the end of a column (3) provided with a second hub (4) at its other end; a slider (9), which can slide on the column (3) and has at least one plurality of inclined planes and means for coupling to lifting means; a lower flange (17), provided with spokes (17d) for connection to a hub (18) which is adapted to mate with the second hub arranged at the end of the column and shaped so as to form engagement means; a plurality of curved panels (19, 22), which are adapted to form a winding surface, are hinged on the spokes of the upper flange (1) and have engagement means at their lower end. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/22; B21C 47/28; B65H 54/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/30 (2006.01); B65H 54/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/58 (2013.01); B21C 47/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1149794 A2 20011031; EP 1149794 A3 20021120; IT MN20000011 A1 20010906; IT MN20000011 D0 20000306

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI