Global Patent Index - EP 1149943 A3

EP 1149943 A3 2002-11-13 - A case for appliances, in particular washing machines

Title (en)

A case for appliances, in particular washing machines

Title (de)

Behälter für Geräte, insbesondere Waschmaschinen

Title (fr)

Boîte pour appareils, en particulier de machines à laver

Publication

EP 1149943 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01830264 A

Priority

IT RM20000218 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1149943A2] A case for appliances, in particular laundry washers, comprising a frame, whereto is destined to be anchored a dynamic appliance apparatus, and an exterior body constituted by a plurality of panels connected to said frame by coupling means, said frame and said body being made of plastic material. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1149943 A2 20011031; EP 1149943 A3 20021113; IT 1317021 B1 20030526; IT RM20000218 A1 20011022; IT RM20000218 D0 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050510

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040624

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI