Global Patent Index - EP 1149948 A3

EP 1149948 A3 2001-12-05 - Method and device for the maintenance of scrapers

Title (en)

Method and device for the maintenance of scrapers

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wartung von Schabern

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la maintenance de racleurs

Publication

EP 1149948 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01104682 A

Priority

DE 10016662 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10016662A1] For the maintenance of a scraper blade (1), especially in the scraper for a roller of cylinder (20) at a papermaking machine, one end of the blade is grasped at its holder (2) by a maintenance unit to withdraw it longitudinally and automatically, and return it into the holder, which automatically cleans and/or sharpens it. The free end of a worn scraper blade can be gripped to pull it longitudinally clear of its holder, and the maintenance unit replaces it with a fresh blade. While the scraper blade is withdrawn, it is formed into a coil by a winder (14), and is unwound when returned into position. In the case of a worn blade, as it is withdrawn it is reduced to part-lengths. An Independent claim is included for a scraper blade maintenance unit, which can be positioned to one side of the machine. It has a scraper blade movement mechanism, with two rollers (4, 5) which grip the blade from both sides and rotate to move the blade longitudinally between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 3/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1149948 A2 20011031; EP 1149948 A3 20011205; DE 10016662 A1 20011011; DE 10016662 B4 20091001

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040329

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI