Global Patent Index - EP 1150072 A3

EP 1150072 A3 2001-12-19 - Gas turbine combustion chamber with supply openings

Title (en)

Gas turbine combustion chamber with supply openings

Title (de)

Gasturbinenbrennkammer mit Zuleitungsöffnung

Title (fr)

Chambre de combustion de turbine à gaz pourvue d'ouvertures d'alimentation

Publication

EP 1150072 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01109768 A

Priority

DE 10020598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1150072A2] An air supply system for a gas turbine engine has separate air apertures for the pilot and main burners. The burners are arranged in a ring duct, between outer (4) and inner (5) walls defining the burn chamber. The pilot burners (2) are mounted on the inner wall and operate at all power settings of the turbine. The main burners (3) are mounted on the outer wall and only operate at the higher turbine powers. The pilot burners feed a pilot burn chamber (20) which leads to the main burn chamber (30) fed by the main burners. Specially shaped and positioned air apertures feed the separate burn chambers for an optimised burn with a minimum of unburnt products, with the apertures for the main burner positioned in the outer wall and those for the pilot burners positioned in the inner wall. The relative axial and radial positioned of the apertures ensures an optimised burn.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/06; F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/06 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/06 (2013.01); F23R 3/346 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1150072 A2 20011031; EP 1150072 A3 20011219; EP 1150072 B1 20060705; DE 10020598 A1 20020307; DE 50110374 D1 20060817; US 2002017101 A1 20020214; US 7654089 B2 20100202

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50110374

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130420

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130420

2013-05-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG, 15827 BLANKENFELDE, DE

- Document: DE 50110374

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-05-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50110374

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-04-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50110374

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER, DE

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120503

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120427

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070410

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50110374 P 20060817

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-07-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041201

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020309

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23R 3/06 A, 7F 23R 3/34 B

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI