Global Patent Index - EP 1150075 B1

EP 1150075 B1 2004-12-22 - Air conditioner-mounting unit

Title (en)

Air conditioner-mounting unit

Title (de)

Halterung einer Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support d'un conditionneur d'air

Publication

EP 1150075 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01109416 A

Priority

JP 2000122714 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1150075A1] A mounting unit for air conditioner (1) to be fixed on wall (15). Mounting board (2) of the unit includes main board (3) and sub board (4). Main board (3) includes flat section (7), locking means (6) for engaging with air conditioner (1) at the top of section (7), and plural fixing slots (9) in section (7). Sub board (4) includes mounting surface (4a), sway-preventing means (4b) formed at the bottom of surface (4a), and plural fixing holes (4c) for securing the board to wall (15). After sub board (4) is fixed to a predetermined position on main board (3), the whole structure -- mounting unit (2) -- is fastened to wall (15). Such structure can retain air conditioner (1) close to wall (15) without swaying. In addition, the economical usage of materials contributes to a reduced die cost for press working, providing a lightweight mounting unit with easy handling in the installation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 13/32 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1150075 A1 20011031; EP 1150075 B1 20041222; CN 1194196 C 20050323; CN 1321863 A 20011114; CN 2482014 Y 20020313; ES 2233517 T3 20050616

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110421

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130606

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110420

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-01-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050400604

- Effective date: 20111102

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100421

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233517 T3

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400604

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031204

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES GR IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011015

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IT

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI