EP 1151619 A1 20011107 - ENCLOSURE FOR HOUSING CABLING AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT
Title (en)
ENCLOSURE FOR HOUSING CABLING AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT
Title (de)
GEHÄUSE ZUR UNTERBRINGUNG VON VERKABELUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGEN EINRICHTUNGEN
Title (fr)
COFFRET DE CABLAGE ET EQUIPEMENT ASSOCIE
Publication
Application
Priority
- GB 0000127 W 20000120
- GB 9901435 A 19990123
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0044182A1] An enclosure for housing cable and associated equipment comprises a frame structure (22) and a plurality of panels (64, 66, 72, 74), the frame structure includes lower supporting means (24, 25) and an upper frame structure (26), the lower supporting means (24, 25) being arranged as a cantilever supported at its rear end, at least some of the panels being detachably mounted on the frame structure (22). One important advantage of the inventive enclosure is that of reduced deflection of the support members due to the weight of the cabling equipment which the enclosure holds.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP)
H02B 1/30 (2013.01); H04Q 1/021 (2013.01); H04Q 1/035 (2013.01); H04Q 1/06 (2013.01); H04Q 1/09 (2013.01); H04Q 2201/02 (2013.01); H04Q 2201/10 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
See references of WO 0044182A1
Citation (third parties)
Third party :
- FR 2702314 A1 19940909 - CLAUX FILS CIE ETS P [FR]
- WO 9839954 A1 19980911 - WILLSHER & QUICK LTD [GB], et al
- EP 0143718 A2 19850605 - MERLIN GERIN [FR]
- EP 0026331 A1 19810408 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- DE 2131772 A1 19721109 - KNUERR KG ELEKTRONIK HANS
- GB 604344 A 19480701 - THOMAS ALBERT HUMPHREYS, et al
- PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 199, no. 703 31 March 1997 (1997-03-31)
- PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 199, no. 710 31 October 1997 (1997-10-31)
- "ASSEMBLY INSTRUCTIONS - NOTICE D'ASSEMBLAGE - MONTAGEANLEITUNG IMRAK 40(15) CONTENTS OF KIT", IMRAK 40(15) CONTENTS OF KIT, XX, XX, 1 January 1999 (1999-01-01), XX, pages 01 - 03, XP001052756
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0044182 A1 20000727; AU 2303200 A 20000807; EP 1151619 A1 20011107; GB 9901435 D0 19990310
DOCDB simple family (application)
GB 0000127 W 20000120; AU 2303200 A 20000120; EP 00901725 A 20000120; GB 9901435 A 19990123