Global Patent Index - EP 1151800 A3

EP 1151800 A3 2002-09-11 - Silenced nozzle for discharge of extinguishing gas

Title (en)

Silenced nozzle for discharge of extinguishing gas

Title (de)

Geräuschlose Düse zum Ausbringen von Löschgas

Title (fr)

Buse silencieuse pour projeter un gaz d'extinction

Publication

EP 1151800 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00126770 A

Priority

IT MI20000989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1151800A2] A silenced nozzle (1) for discharge of extinguishing gas comprises a base body (2) and a cover (3) that contain a filter assembly (4) to attenuate noise during discharge of extinguishing gas, a hole (7) being formed in the cover (3) for entry of the extinguishing gas, a plurality of extinguishing gas outlet holes (9, 21) being provided both in the base body and in the cover, the nozzle (1) having a hole (8) for propagation of the gas with a larger diameter with respect to the diameter of the gas inlet hole (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/00; A62C 31/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 31/05 (2006.01); B05B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/00 (2013.01); A62C 31/05 (2013.01); A62C 99/0018 (2013.01); B05B 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1151800 A2 20011107; EP 1151800 A3 20020911; IT 1317475 B1 20030709; IT MI20000989 A1 20011105; IT MI20000989 D0 20000505; ZA 200103341 B 20011026

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080410

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GASTEC-VESTA S.R.L.

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI