Global Patent Index - EP 1151924 A3

EP 1151924 A3 2003-06-04 - Paper container

Title (en)

Paper container

Title (de)

Papierbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient en papier

Publication

EP 1151924 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01110694 A

Priority

  • JP 2000133870 A
  • JP 2000156871 A
  • JP 2000156872 A
  • JP 2000161019 A
  • JP 2000168141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1151924A2] In a paper container 10 having a hexahedral configuration which is formed by shaping paper into a box, the paper container 10 comprises a container main body 12 and a lid member 14 hingedly attached to a back side edge part of an upper end open surface 13 of the container main body 12 and adapted to open/close the upper end open surface 13, a front board 15 of the container main body 12 being formed with a concave cutout part 16 extending from the upper end open surface 13. The lid member 14 comprises an upper surface lid part 17 for covering the upper end open surface 13, a front surface lid part 18 large enough to cover the concave cutout part 16, and a pair of side lid parts 19 interposed between side edge parts of the upper surface lid part 17 and side edge parts of the front surface lid part 18 and adapted to vertically join the front surface lid part 18 with the upper surface lid part 17. A tongue-like lock part 26 is disposed beneath the concave cutout part 16 and adapted to lock a lower end part of the front surface lid part 18 of the lid member 14. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/66; B65D 5/02; B65D 5/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/02 (2006.01); B65D 5/54 (2006.01); B65D 5/56 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 65/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/0227 (2013.01); B65D 5/543 (2013.01); B65D 5/563 (2013.01); B65D 5/566 (2013.01); B65D 5/6608 (2013.01); B65D 65/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1151924 A2 20011107; EP 1151924 A3 20030604; EP 1151924 B1 20070711; DE 60129271 D1 20070823; DE 60129271 T2 20071018; DE 60135035 D1 20080904; EP 1568614 A2 20050831; EP 1568614 A3 20051207; EP 1568614 B1 20080723; TW 476728 B 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150502

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150502

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60129271

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140509

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080414

2007-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60129271 P 20070823

2007-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-07-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/66 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/54 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 5/02 B

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI