Global Patent Index - EP 1152089 A3

EP 1152089 A3 2003-06-25 - Improved motor sweeper with elastic regulation of the brush pressure

Title (en)

Improved motor sweeper with elastic regulation of the brush pressure

Title (de)

Motorisierte Kehrmaschine mit elastischer Kontrolle des Bürstendruckes

Title (fr)

Balayeuse à moteur avec régulation élastique de la pression de la brosse

Publication

EP 1152089 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01201532 A

Priority

IT RE20000036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1152089A2] A motor sweeper comprising a wheeled frame (1) for supporting a height-adjustable brush (2) of horizontal axis, and a rearward-lying dirt collection bin, said brush being rotated by a motor, there being provided means for measuring a quantity indicative of the pressure exerted by the brush on the surface to be cleaned, and mechanical means (100) for adjusting the height of said brush; elastic means (200) are associated with said mechanical means (100) in such a manner that the height of the brush is adjusted by the mechanical means (100) if the value of the quantity indicative of the pressure exerted by the brush on the surface lies outside a predetermined range, and by the elastic means (200) if the value of said indicative quantity lies within said range. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 1/056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1152089 A2 20011107; EP 1152089 A3 20030625; IT 1319463 B1 20031010; IT RE20000036 A1 20011105

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070827

2006-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IP CLEANING S.P.A.

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI