Global Patent Index - EP 1152098 A3

EP 1152098 A3 2001-12-12 - Fluting and coping roof tile with attachable bracket

Title (en)

Fluting and coping roof tile with attachable bracket

Title (de)

Mönch und Nonne-Dachziegel mit anbringbarem Halter

Title (fr)

Tuile de courant et de couvert avec élément de fixation rapporté

Publication

EP 1152098 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01109798 A

Priority

IT BZ20000022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1152098A2] A method for securing overlapping tiles without having retaining lugs on the tiles has holes provided near the top edge of each tile, either before or after firing. Metal reinforced plastic studs (3) are fitted into the holes and support the bottom edge of the next, overlapping tile. The design is especially applicable for the tile design with alternate rows facing upwards and downwards to interlock into a complete roof. The bottom tile of each row is secured by a metal clip (2). A simple design of stud has a slit shaft with retaining grips to clip into each hole.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/34; E04D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/04 (2006.01); E04D 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/045 (2013.01); E04D 1/34 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3417 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3423 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3429 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3467 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3485 (2013.01); E04D 2001/3497 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1152098 A2 20011107; EP 1152098 A3 20011212; IT BZ20000022 A1 20011105

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050923

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: MK PAYMENT 20010423;SI PAYMENT 20010423

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK PAYMENT 20010423;RO;SI PAYMENT 20010423

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK PAYMENT 20010423;RO;SI PAYMENT 20010423