Global Patent Index - EP 1152115 A3

EP 1152115 A3 2002-11-13 - Hinge with locking means particularly for folding shutters

Title (en)

Hinge with locking means particularly for folding shutters

Title (de)

Scharnier mit Verriegelung, insbesondere für Faltladen

Title (fr)

Charnière avec verrouillage, en particulier pour volets pliants

Publication

EP 1152115 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01110088 A

Priority

IT MI20000267 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1152115A2] A hinge (1) with locking means particularly for folding shutters, comprising a female body (2) and a male body (3) which are mutually joined by a hinging pivot (4) and can be respectively coupled to a coupling portion (20) and to a folding portion (21) of a shutter; a locking protrusion (10) is connected to the pivot (4) for detachably engaging a locking seat (11) formed by a fixed structure (12) to which the shutter is connected; the pivot (4) is rigidly connected to the male body (3) associated with the folding portion (21) of the shutter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/26; E05B 65/00; E05D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/04 (2006.01); E06B 9/06 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/04 (2013.01); E05D 11/0027 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/146 (2013.01); E06B 9/0669 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1152115 A2 20011107; EP 1152115 A3 20021113; IT 250082 Y1 20030707; IT MI20000267 U1 20011105; IT MI20000267 V0 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05D 15/26 A, 7E 05D 11/00 B, 7E 05B 65/00 B

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI