Global Patent Index - EP 1152144 A3

EP 1152144 A3 2002-12-18 - Hydraulically-actuated fuel injector with direct control needle valve

Title (en)

Hydraulically-actuated fuel injector with direct control needle valve

Title (de)

Elektro-hydraulisch betätigtes Kraftstoffeinspritzventil mit einer Düsennadel, die direkt angesteuert wird

Title (fr)

Injecteur de carburant à actionnement hydraulique avec une soupape à pointeau à commande directe

Publication

EP 1152144 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01117613 A

Priority

  • EP 97306118 A
  • US 70780496 A
  • US 76801496 A
  • US 86460697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1152144A2] A hydraulically actuated fuel injector (14') includes an injector body (105) having an actuation fluid inlet (106) and a needle control chamber (118). A hydraulic means within the injector pressurizes fuel in the injector body (105). The hydraulic means includes an actuation fluid control valve (140) having a solenoid (130) and is movable to open and close the actuation fluid inlet (106). A needle valve member (160) includes a closing hydraulic surface (167) exposed to pressure in the needle control chamber (118). A needle control valve (136), which utilizes the same solenoid (130), is mounted in the injector body (105) and movable to open and close the needle control chamber (118) to a source of high pressure fluid (106). The slower response time of the actuation fluid control valve (140) allows for direct control of the fast responding needle valve (160) by a single fast acting two-way solenoid (130). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 57/02; F02M 47/02; F02M 59/10; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/04 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/04 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 57/025 (2013.01); F02M 57/026 (2013.01); F02M 59/105 (2013.01); F02M 59/466 (2013.01); F02M 63/0029 (2013.01); F02M 63/0042 (2013.01); F02M 63/0045 (2013.01); F02M 63/0049 (2013.01); F02M 2200/21 (2013.01); F02M 2200/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1152145 A2 20011107; EP 1152145 A3 20021218; EP 1152145 B1 20040526; EP 1152144 A2 20011107; EP 1152144 A3 20021218; EP 1152144 B1 20040218

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090812

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090812

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080708

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080807

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69727713 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0826877 P

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-08-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030606

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 57/02 A, 7F 02M 47/02 B, 7F 02M 59/10 B, 7F 02M 59/46 B

2001-11-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 826877

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB