Global Patent Index - EP 1152187 A3

EP 1152187 A3 2002-11-13 - Lighting device

Title (en)

Lighting device

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 1152187 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01830287 A

Priority

IT TO20000407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1152187A2] Lighting device comprising a light source (2), a primary reflector (4), presenting a double volute (6, 7) cross-section profile and a secondary reflector (5), which reflects the light rays directly from the source (2) and from the primary reflector (4) to form a light beam directed outwards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 13/04; F21V 7/00; F21V 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/09 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/09 (2013.01); F21S 8/00 (2013.01); F21V 7/0008 (2013.01); F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21V 5/002 (2013.01); F21W 2106/00 (2018.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1152187 A2 20011107; EP 1152187 A3 20021113; EP 1152187 B1 20041117; DE 60107139 D1 20041223; DE 60107139 T2 20060209; DE 60107297 D1 20041223; DE 60107297 T2 20060209; DE 60107297 T8 20060427; EP 1376008 A2 20040102; EP 1376008 A3 20040128; EP 1376008 B1 20041117; ES 2231423 T3 20050516; ES 2231752 T3 20050516; IT 1320063 B1 20031112; IT TO20000407 A1 20011102; IT TO20000407 D0 20000502

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60107139

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-04-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120430

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090504

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080408

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-20 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20071018

2005-10-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231423 T3

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107139 P 20041223

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-11-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030121

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 13/04 A, 7F 21V 7/09 B, 7F 21V 7/00 B, 7F 21W 101:08 Z, 7F 21W 131:40 Z, 7F 21W 131:10 Z, 7F 21Y 101:00 Z

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI