Global Patent Index - EP 1152676 A4

EP 1152676 A4 2002-09-04 - HEAD SUPPORT DEVICE FOR INFANTS

Title (en)

HEAD SUPPORT DEVICE FOR INFANTS

Title (de)

KOPFSTÜTZE

Title (fr)

SUPPORT DE TETE POUR ENFANTS

Publication

EP 1152676 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00904358 A

Priority

  • US 0000958 W
  • US 23619099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6052850A] A suitable support device for newborns including premature babies comprises a doughnut-shaped structure having a gel-filled GORE-TEX casing of about five to six inches outer diameter with a central aperture of about two to three inches in diameter. The structure provides an annular tube having about a 1 to 2 inch diameter. The tube is preferably circular in cross-section at the rear or head region and preferably flattened to provide a generally oval cross-section at the front or neck region. The case is filled with a cohesive gel mass such as silicone gel or silicone elastomers with sufficiently cross-linked polysiloxane networks to substantially retain a selected shape despite the force of a limited incident weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 9/10 (2013.01); Y10S 5/909 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6052850 A 20000425; AT 278345 T 20041015; AU 2613000 A 20000807; AU 762388 B2 20030626; BR 0008756 A 20011030; CA 2358513 A1 20000727; CA 2358513 C 20070918; CN 1184918 C 20050119; CN 1337860 A 20020227; CN 1650778 A 20050810; DE 60014584 D1 20041111; DE 60014584 T2 20051020; DK 1152676 T3 20050207; EP 1152676 A1 20011114; EP 1152676 A4 20020904; EP 1152676 B1 20041006; ES 2230061 T3 20050501; IS 6004 A 20010713; JP 2002535019 A 20021022; JP 4252217 B2 20090408; MX PA01007420 A 20020604; NO 20013470 A 20010920; NO 20013470 D0 20010713; NZ 513599 A 20030429; PT 1152676 E 20050228; WO 0042888 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111223

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SALIDO CYNTHIA R.

- Effective date: 20050131

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SALIDO RUDOLPH E.

- Effective date: 20050131

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-11-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-10-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051014

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-05 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-08-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-08-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SALIDO CYNTHIA R.

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SALIDO RUDOLPH E.

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230061 T3

2005-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041229

2005-02-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400021

2005-02-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-01-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-01-14 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-14 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2004-11-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60014584 P 20041111

2004-11-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO