Global Patent Index - EP 1152877 B1

EP 1152877 B1 2003-06-04 - METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS MACHINING OF PLATE-LIKE PRODUCTS OF WOOD, WOOD-DERIVED MATERIALS OR SIMILAR MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS MACHINING OF PLATE-LIKE PRODUCTS OF WOOD, WOOD-DERIVED MATERIALS OR SIMILAR MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHLAUF-BEARBEITUNG VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN PRODUKTEN AUS HOLZ, HOLZWERKSTOFFEN ODER ARTVERWANDTEN WERKSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'USINAGE EN CONTINU DE PRODUITS EN FORME DE PLAQUES EN BOIS, EN MATERIAUX DERIVES DU BOIS OU EN MATERIAUX SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 1152877 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99967012 A

Priority

  • DE 19906278 A
  • EP 9910391 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19906278C1] The invention relates to a method for continuous machining of panel-shaped products made of wood, wooden material or similar products. In order to obtain a higher production capacity, the invention is characterized by the following steps: a) the fed panels (1) are temporarily stored in a magazine in such a way that the surfaces to be machined alternatingly lie on the top and on the bottom; b) two panels (4) placed one on top of the other are fed together to a drilling and/or milling station in such a way that the surfaces to be machined face outward; c) the outer surfaces and/or the narrow faces of the panels which are placed one on top of the other are machined together and simultaneously in a cycle and d) the panels machined on one side are separated (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27M 1/08; B27C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27C 9/00 (2006.01); B27C 9/04 (2006.01); B27D 5/00 (2006.01); B27M 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27D 5/003 (2013.01); B27C 9/04 (2013.01); B27M 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IE LU PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19906278 C1 20000224; AT 251975 T 20031115; AU 2546700 A 20000904; EP 1152877 A1 20011114; EP 1152877 B1 20030604; WO 0048803 A1 20000824; WO 0048804 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031227

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905891 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IE LU PT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-10-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS MACHINING OF PLATE-LIKE PRODUCTS OF WOOD, WOOD-DERIVED MATERIALS OR SIMILAR MATERIAL

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IE LU PT SE