Global Patent Index - EP 1153371 B1

EP 1153371 B1 2002-09-11 - OPTICAL SENSOR WITH PLANAR WALL

Title (en)

OPTICAL SENSOR WITH PLANAR WALL

Title (de)

OPTISCHER SENSOR MIT EBENER WAND

Title (fr)

CAPTEUR OPTIQUE AVEC UNE PAROI PLANE

Publication

EP 1153371 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904648 A

Priority

CA 9900116 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049582A1] An improved optical sensor for a banknote validator uses an aspherical lens having a planar wall as a combination radiation plug for a port in the pathway and a focusing arrangement. Emitters and receivers are closely positioned on a common support and generally located at the focal point of the lens. The radiation reflected by a banknote is focused and received by the receiver. The lens also serves to collimate the produced radiation of the emitters for scanning of the banknote.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/121 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049582 A1 20000824; AU 2506199 A 20000904; AU 772395 B2 20040429; CA 2358709 A1 20000824; CA 2358709 C 20050802; DE 69902948 D1 20021017; DE 69902948 T2 20030522; EP 1153371 A1 20011114; EP 1153371 B1 20020911; ES 2183511 T3 20030316; JP 2002537616 A 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150217

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150217

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69902948

2015-06-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CRANE CANADA CO., TORONTO, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CASHCODE COMPANY INC., CONCORD, ONTARIO, CA

- Document: DE 69902948

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-06-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902948

- Representative's name: KROHER - STROBEL RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20150512

2015-05-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902948

- Representative's name: KROHER - STROBEL RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE

2015-02-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150129 AND 20150204

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120218

2013-07-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130709

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183511 T3

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902948 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB