Global Patent Index - EP 1153472 A4

EP 1153472 A4 2002-11-27 - PERMANENT MAGNET D.C. MOTOR HAVING A RADIALLY-DISPOSED WORKING FLUX GAP

Title (en)

PERMANENT MAGNET D.C. MOTOR HAVING A RADIALLY-DISPOSED WORKING FLUX GAP

Title (de)

DAVERMAGNET-GLEICHSTROMMOTOR MIT RADIALEM LUFTSPALT.

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COURANT CONTINU A AIMANTS PERMANENTS A ENTREFER DE TRAVAIL DISPOSE RADIALEMENT

Publication

EP 1153472 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99973722 A

Priority

US 9903808 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0051224A1] A permanent magnet D.C. motor (90) includes a stator assembly (112) with a plurality of upstanding discrete spaced-apart core components (116) formed in a circular locus generally parallel with the motor axis. Each core component includes a relatively lengthy winding association region and extending therefrom a pole piece region (128) providing a flux interaction surface. A field winding (122) mounted upon a bobbin is positioned over a core component at the winding association region. A permanent magnet component (130) is carried by a rotor (100) such that its interaction surface is adjacent to that at the pole piece region (128), and is spaced therefrom to define a flux working air gap (132).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 21/24; H02K 1/14; H02K 21/12; H02K 29/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 1/14 (2006.01); H02K 21/12 (2006.01); H02K 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 21/12 (2013.01); H02K 1/146 (2013.01); H02K 29/08 (2013.01); H02K 2201/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0051224 A1 20000831; CA 2362686 A1 20000831; EP 1153472 A1 20011114; EP 1153472 A4 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050908

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-11-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 02K 21/24 A, 7H 02K 1/14 B, 7H 02K 21/12 B, 7H 02K 29/08 B

2002-04-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETERSEN, CHRISTIAN C.

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE